Bailey et al v. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sonia Gryske, Heather Hobson, Daryl Bartholomeo, Janice Degeus, Eric Fickling, Susan Bailey, Thomas Messer, Mark Hobson, Patricia Phelim, Jennifer Hausman, Richard VanCampen, Abraham Miranda, Jose Hernandez, Diedra Booker, Cameron Krug, Elly Lin, Jemaal Knox, Marlene Knox, Nancy Johnson, Lauryn Meyer, Ashley Dixon, Kyoungah Lee, Mark Allred, Jeremy Hausman, Donna Fickling, Harry Jackson, Hidolina Miranda, Ethel VanCampen, Renea Bartholomeo, Sarah Mescher, Alan Dixon, Stanley Phillips, Doreen Phillips, Steven Marks, Kristine Hernandez, Richard Robinson, Randy Fisher, Kelly Longenecker, Friah Rogers, Teresa Sharp and Vanessa Marks
Defendant: Wyndham Destination Network, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. and RCI, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05325
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 59 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Parties Report on ADR discussion (Duran, Jack) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held by Zoom on 8/19/2020. The parties will file a stipulation regarding ADR by 10/15/2020 (8/15/2020 stated in Court). The Court set the following case schedule: Initial Disclosures: 8/31/2020. Close of Fact Discovery: 1/29/2021.Opening Expert Reports: 2/19/2021. Rebuttal Expert Reports: 3/5/2021. Close of Expert Discovery: 4/2/2021. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Jury Trial set for 8/16/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Total Time in Court: 4 minutes. Zoom Recording Time: 10:40-10:44. Plaintiff Attorney: Jack Duran. Defendant Attorney: Geoffrey Davis. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/19/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 57 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM WEBINAR ACCESS AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION BY 8/17/2020, AT 10:00 AM, FOR UPCOMING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2020, 10:00 AM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than Monday, August 17, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1612857657?pwd=WE5Gcm1zS293WU84V0tyd0c2Ulp1UT09Meeting ID: 161 285 7657Password: 547298Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/z oom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2020, 10:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 56 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Susan Bailey. (Duran, Jack) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 GENERAL ORDER FOR PENDING CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE VINCE CHHABRIA. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/29/2020. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING A FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR 8/19/2020. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2020 10:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 53 Answer to Amended Complaint #51 Amended Complaint RCI, LLCs Answer To Third Amended Complaint; Demand For Jury Trial byRCI, Inc, Wyndham Destination Network, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 52 Answer to Amended Complaint #51 Amended Complaint Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.s Answer To Third Amended Complaint; Demand For Jury Trial byWyndham Destination Network, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 51 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended against All Defendants. Filed byJanice Degeus. (Duran, Jack) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING DEADLINE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Third Amended Complaint due by 6/26/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #41 Motion to Dismiss. Third Amended Complaint due by 7/6/2020. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held via Zoom Webinar on 6/4/2020 re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by RCI, Inc, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. The Court heard oral argument and will issue a written ruling.Total Time in Court: 28 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar: 10:09 - 10:37. Plaintiff Attorney: Jack Duran. Defendant Attorney: Geoffrey Davis. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/4/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 47 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING 6/4/2020 HEARING TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Hearing on #41 Motion to Dismiss set for 6/4/2020 10:00 AM by Zoom Webinar. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than Tuesday, June 2 at 2:00 PM.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public, and press, please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/85315209832?pwd=WjZCMWxCTWQzaUREckZsVmFyanJldz09Meeting ID: 853 1520 9832Password: 177331Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Chambers before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the cour t. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 46 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE MOTION HEARING SET FOR 4/30/2020 TO 6/4/2020.Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY (re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint) - DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(6) AND RULE 9(b), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(e) - - - [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #44 ] filed by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 44 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(6) AND RULE 9(b), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(e) filed byWyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RESETTING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS. Reply brief due 4/16/2020. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/10/2020. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 42 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed bySusan Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Knox 1, #2 Exhibit Knox 2, #3 Exhibit Knox 3, #4 Exhibit Krug)(Duran, Jack) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by RCI, Inc, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 4/1/2020. Replies due by 4/8/2020. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 40 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Janice Degeus. (Duran, Jack) (Filed on 3/4/2020) Modified on 3/5/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2020. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria withdrawing #37 Motion to Dismiss; granting #38 Stipulation for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Second Amended Complaint due March 4, 2020. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #36 Amended Complaint, #37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RCI, Inc, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. and Janice Degues, et al. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/3/2020) Modified on 2/4/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 2/4/2020. Replies due by 2/11/2020. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended against All Defendants. Filed byJanice Degeus. (Duran, Jack) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the telephonic initial case management conference scheduled for 12/18/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2020. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint filed by Susan Bailey. (Duran, Jack) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Plaintiffs (Duran, Jack) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 31 Statement Plaintiffs LR 3-5 Disclosure by Susan Bailey. (Duran, Jack) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 26 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by RCI, Inc identifying Other Affiliate Wyndham Destination Network, LLC, Other Affiliate RCI General Holdco 2, LLC for RCI, Inc. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 25 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Wyndham Destination Network, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. for Wyndham Destination Network, LLC. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 24 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Wyndham Destinations, Inc. for Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 9, 2019 Filing 23 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/5/2019, RE #8 MOTION TO DISMISS. The Court will issue a written ruling based on the motion and responsive briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE TIME FOR THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONVERTING THE HEARING TO A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The matter is rescheduled to the following time due to one or more parties requesting to appear telephonically at the hearing. Defendant shall provide the Court and all other parties a conference line and applicable access code to use during the hearing no later than three court days prior to the case management conference by way of email to the Court (vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov) with a cc to opposing counsel. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2019 10:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 11/27/2019 TO 12/18/2019. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byRCI, Inc, Wyndham Destination Network, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) Hearing 12/5/19 10:00 am VC S.F.CA filed bySusan Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fact Supplement)(Duran, Jack) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Wyndham Destination Network, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. re 10 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only,,, 12 Clerk's Notice,,,, NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS. Responses due by 10/31/2019. Replies due by 11/7/2019. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/17/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Stip to EOT to File MTD Response filed by Susan Bailey. (Duran, Jack) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages / Stipulated Administrative Motion for Leave to Retain Brief in Excess of 15 pages in Support of Motion to Dismiss or for More Definite Statement filed by RCI, Inc, Wyndham Destination Network, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING THE DATE FOR THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/27/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Chhabria's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 11/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 10/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by RCI, Inc, Wyndham Destination Network, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc... (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by RCI, Inc, Wyndham Destination Network, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 10/17/2019. Replies due by 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration, #8 Proposed Order)(Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Susan Bailey.. (Duran, Jack) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to RCI, Inc, Wyndham Destination Network, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13647041.). Filed byDonna Fickling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Duran, Jack) (Filed on 8/26/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey et al v. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Gryske
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Hobson
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Bartholomeo
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Degeus
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Fickling
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Bailey
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Messer
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hobson
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Phelim
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hausman
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard VanCampen
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Miranda
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Hernandez
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diedra Booker
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Krug
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elly Lin
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jemaal Knox
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Knox
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Johnson
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauryn Meyer
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Dixon
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyoungah Lee
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Allred
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hausman
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Fickling
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Jackson
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hidolina Miranda
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel VanCampen
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renea Bartholomeo
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Mescher
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Dixon
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Phillips
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Phillips
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Marks
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Hernandez
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Robinson
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Fisher
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Longenecker
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friah Rogers
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Sharp
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Marks
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Destination Network, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCI, Inc
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?