Kenjoni v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Rahim R. Kenjoni
Defendant: Warden Nathan Allen, Richard T. Valeika, M.D. William Barr, Kevin K. McAleenan, Nathan Allen and William Barr
Case Number: 3:2019cv05361
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 35 ERRATA re #32 Traverse (with Attachment A for Doc. 32) by Rahim R. Kenjoni. (Jorjani, Raha) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/22/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rahim R. Kenjoni (Jorjani, Raha) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 32 Traverse (Petitioner's Response to Documents Produced by Respondents) byRahim R. Kenjoni. (Jorjani, Raha) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by William Barr, Kevin K. McAleenan, Richard T. Valeika re 26 Motion Hearing,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, #25 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 30 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 30, 2019, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #27 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2020. (Related documents(s) #27 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 29 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/3/19, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #28 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2020. (Related documents(s) #28 ) (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/3/19 before Judge William Alsup by William Barr, Kevin K. McAleenan, Richard T. Valeika, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/30/19 before Judge William Alsup by William Barr, Kevin K. McAleenan, Richard T. Valeika, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 10/3/2019. ; granting in part and denying in part #19 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Court orders the petitioner to remain in this district until the Court rules on the Motion to Transfer. If the Court rules that the case is transferred to this district, then the defendant is order to ensure that the petitioner remains in this district. If the case is transferred to Arizona, then the petitioner may be transferred to Arizona as well.Total Time in Court: 4 minutes. Court Reporter: Ruth Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Raha Jorjani. Defendant Attorney: Kim Robinson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE #18 MOTION TO ADVANCE COMPLIANCE DATE AND MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Rahim R. Kenjoni of Change of Venue Motion (Jorjani, Raha) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 9/30/2019. re #19 Emergency MOTION to Stay Imminent Transfer filed by Rahim R. Kenjoni. Court instructs Petitioner's Counsel to file the Motion to Transfer on ECF by 4;00 pm today. Court orders that the petitioner to remain in Mesa Verde Detention Facility until the further hearing on the Motion to Stay set for Thursday at 11:00 AM. Court instructs Government Counsel to be prepared to advise the court of petitioners health and criminal history. Continued Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup.Total Time in Court: 41 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Raha Jorjani. Defendant Attorney: Michelle Lo/Adrienne Zack. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 22 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 Emergency MOTION to Stay Imminent Transfer ) filed byWilliam Barr, Kevin K. McAleenan, Richard T. Valeika. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FURTHER ORDER RE EMERGENCY MOTION TO TEMPORARILY STAY IMMINENT TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/28/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2019)
September 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 Emergency MOTION to Stay Imminent Transfer. Responses due by 9/30/2019. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2019 12:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2019)
September 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE #19 EMERGENCY MOTION TO TEMPORARILY STAY IMMINENT TRANSFER AND SETTING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/28/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2019)
September 28, 2019 Filing 19 Emergency MOTION to Stay Imminent Transfer filed by Rahim R. Kenjoni. Responses due by 10/15/2019. Replies due by 10/22/2019. (Jorjani, Raha) (Filed on 9/28/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION Advance Compliance Date and Modify Briefing Schedule filed by Rahim R. Kenjoni. Responses due by 10/11/2019. Replies due by 10/18/2019. (Jorjani, Raha) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 17 Response re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus byWilliam Barr, Kevin K. McAleenan, Richard T. Valeika. Traverse due by 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #3 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REQUEST ON ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/17/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Rahim R. Kenjoni of Critical Factual Development and request to compel clarification from respondents (Jorjani, Raha) (Filed on 9/16/2019) Modified on 9/17/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines re #13 Order: Motion Hearing re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus set for 11/14/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE #12 STIPULATED REQUEST SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Briefing Schedule filed by William Barr. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 toJudge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 5, 2019 Copies of #5 Order to Show Cause and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus mailed to respondent and U.S. Attorney, Northern District. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William Barr.. (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/17/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Anne Robinson (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Rahim R. Kenjoni of DHS Decision to Continue Detention (Jorjani, Raha) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IMMIGRATION HABEAS CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/29/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rahim R. Kenjoni.. (Jorjani, Raha) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Rahim R. Kenjoni. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted version of Habeas Petition, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibits)(Jorjani, Raha) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/10/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 0971-13650297.). Filed byRahim R. Kenjoni. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Jorjani, Raha) (Filed on 8/26/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenjoni v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Nathan Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard T. Valeika
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Allen
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Rahim R. Kenjoni
Represented By: Raha Jorjani
Represented By: Brendon DeWayne Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?