FWK Holdings, LLC v. Bausch Health Companies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: FWK Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Bausch Health Companies Inc., LUPIN LTD, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., SANTARUS, INC., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. and Lupin Ltd.
Petitioner: City of Providence, H-E-B LP, Albertsons Companies Inc., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05426
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1; #72 in No. 3:19-cv-05426-WHA; #65 in No. 3:19-cv-05822-WHA; #63 in No. 3:19-cv-05831-WHA; #57 in No. 3:19-cv-06138-WHA; #55 in No. 3:19-cv-06156-WHA; #66 in No. 3:19-cv-06839-WHA; #9 in No. 3:19-cv-07843-WHA. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 74 Letter from A.J. de Bartolomeo . (De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 73 Statement in Support of Defendants' [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by FWK Holdings, LLC, City of Providence, Walgreen Co., Santarus, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Baush Health Companies Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Ltd. and Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order JOINT STIPULATION SEEKING ENTRY OF AMENDED [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1)(De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 12/12/2019) Modified on 12/12/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2019 Filing 71 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/5/19, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporterr Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (64 in 3:19-cv-05426-WHA) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2020. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/05/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/05/2019 before Judge William Alsup by FWK Holdings, LLC, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/6/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/05/2019 before Judge William Alsup for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/05/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Bank, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/5/2019. New proposed scheduling order and proposed order of consolidation due by 12/12/2019. Discovery begins, effective today, 12/5/2019. Court to issue written order re: appointment of interim counsel. (Total Time in Court: 55 minutes.) Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: A.J. de Bartolomeo (FWK Holdings, LLC & KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.), Steve Shadowen (FWK Holdings, LLC & BI-LO, LLC et al); Joseph Vanek, Lauren Barnes (Meijer, Inc. & Meijer Distribution, Inc.); Whitney Street (City of Providence); Gregory Asciolla (UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund); Sarah DeLoach (KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.). Defendant Attorney: Laura Shores, Daniel Asimow; Eric Stock, Victoria Weatherford (Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.); Jeffrey Bank, Brendan Coffman, Thu Hoang (Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. & Lupin Ltd.); George Gordon (PDL Biopharma, Inc.). Movant Attorney: Anna Neill (Walgreen Co.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/05/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Thu Vu Tam Hoang. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #54 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Brendan J. Coffman. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Seth C. Silber. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 60 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 filed by Walgreen Co., Albertsons Companies Inc., H-E-B LP, The Kroger Co.. Responses due by 12/9/2019. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Thu Vu Tam Hoang ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13946187.) filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Hoang, Thu) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 58 Declaration of Lauren Guth Barnes in Support of #56 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION TO APPOINT INTERIM COLEAD DIRECT-PURCHASER CLASS COUNSEL filed byFWK Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Related document(s) #56 ) (De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPOINT INTERIM CO-LEAD DIRECTPURCHASER CLASS COUNSEL re #56 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION TO APPOINT INTERIM COLEAD DIRECT-PURCHASER CLASS COUNSEL filed by FWK Holdings, LLC. (Related document(s) #56 ) (De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 12/3/2019) Modified on 12/4/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION TO APPOINT INTERIM COLEAD DIRECT-PURCHASER CLASS COUNSEL filed by FWK Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. REGARDING [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brendan J Coffman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13943703.) filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Coffman, Brendan) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Seth C Silber ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13943645.) filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Silber, Seth) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Laura S. Shores. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Laura S. Shores ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13938386.) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Shores, Laura) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Eric J. Stock. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors, a subsidiary of BlackRock, Inc. for Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Eric J. Stock ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13933901.) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stock, Eric) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 47 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by FWK Holdings, LLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., City of Province, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Santarus, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin Ltd. (De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 11/27/2019) Modified on 11/27/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
November 27, 2019 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FWK Holdings, LLC (De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Filed byFWK Holdings, LLC. (De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jeffrey C. Bank. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Bank ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13913507.) filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Bank, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Corporate Parent Lupin Inc. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Other Affiliate Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Other Affiliate Lupin Inc. for Lupin Ltd.. (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Corporate Parent Lupin Inc. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Other Affiliate Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Other Affiliate Lupin Inc. for Lupin Ltd.. (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by FWK Holdings, LLC, Santarus, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Ltd., City of Providence, Bausch Health Companies Inc., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 11/14/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Document filed in wrong case. [err401] Re: #37 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 39 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on Behalf of Defendants Bausch Health Companies, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Santarus, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bausch Health Companies Inc. for Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 37 *** DISREGARD. FILED IN WRONG CASE. *** ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 11/14/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2019 Filing 36 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Saul P. Morgenstern on Behalf of Defendants Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Santarus, Inc. (Morgenstern, Saul) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Asimow on Behalf of Defendants Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Santarus, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Leigh Weatherford for Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Lynn Devine (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed on behalf of FWK Holdings, LLC (De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE that case C-19-5429-WHA is NOT related to case C-09-5587-PJH. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. of Filing of Reply In Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 27 **** DISREGARD. FILED IN WRONG CASE. *** NOTICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. [Corrected] of Filing Regarding Administrative Motions to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/25/2019) Modified on 10/28/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2019 Filing 26 ***DISREGARD. ERROR IN FILING. SEE #28 FOR CORRECTED FILING. *** NOTICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. of Filing of Reply in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/25/2019) Modified on 10/28/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2019 Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #23 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for order relating cases ) Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 3-12 and 7-11 filed byBausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by FWK Holdings, LLC NOTICE OF FILING OF PLAINTIFFS JOINT RESPONSE TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 3-12 AND 7-11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 23 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for order relating cases filed by City of Providence. Responses due by 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - F, #2 Declaration Whitney E. Street, #3 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) (Plaintiffs Only), #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Street, Whitney) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. OF FILING OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incomplete PDF attached. [err201]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #21 Notice of Change of Address filed by FWK Holdings, LLC (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Address by A.J. De Bartolomeo (De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaints [Civil Local Rule 6-1(a)] filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Matthew C. Weiner. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Steve D. Shadowen. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nicholas W. Shadowen. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13797701.) filed by FWK Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Weiner, Matthew) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13797662.) filed by FWK Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Shadowen, Steve) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 Second MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Nicholas Shadowen (Filing fee $ 310.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/9/19 filed by FWK Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Shadowen, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Judge William Alsup denying #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Nicholas W. Shadowen.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Nicholas Shadowen ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13777827.) filed by FWK Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Shadowen, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/10/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FWK Holdings, LLC.. (De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/19/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/27/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., LUPIN LTD, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SANTARUS, INC., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13659448.). Filed byFWK Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 8/29/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FWK Holdings, LLC v. Bausch Health Companies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Represented By: Saul P. Morgenstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bausch Health Companies Inc.
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Represented By: Saul P. Morgenstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Thu Vu Tam Hoang
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Devine
Represented By: Seth C Silber
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Bank
Represented By: Brendan Jasper Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Represented By: Saul P. Morgenstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTARUS, INC.
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Represented By: Saul P. Morgenstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Victoria Leigh Weatherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Represented By: Thu Vu Tam Hoang
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Devine
Represented By: Seth C Silber
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Bank
Represented By: Brendan Jasper Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FWK Holdings, LLC
Represented By: A.J. De Bartolomeo
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Providence
Represented By: Whitney E. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: H-E-B LP
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Albertsons Companies Inc.
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?