Moore v. Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Moore
Defendant: Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC and Essentia Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv05453
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/3/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 10/03/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Essentia Insurance Company, Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC.. (Carmel, Rina) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended) byEssentia Insurance Company, Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC. (Carmel, Rina) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/30/2019. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by Essentia Insurance Company, Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC re #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Carmel, Rina) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/4/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2019 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Donald William McCormick. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the Notice Of Removal at Docket no. #1 . Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/12/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Essentia Insurance Company, Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Essentia Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Hagerty Group, LLC for Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC. (Carmel, Rina) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1441 from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is SCV-263643. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13662888). Filed byEssentia Insurance Company, Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carmel, Rina) (Filed on 8/29/2019) Modified on 8/30/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC
Represented By: Rina Carmel
Represented By: Donald William McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essentia Insurance Company
Represented By: Rina Carmel
Represented By: Donald William McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Moore
Represented By: Salvatore Carmine Timpano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?