Hotton v. L & S Land Co. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Hotton
Defendant: L & S Land Co., Richard Scardigli and Albert Laudel
Case Number: 3:2019cv05500
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Referring Judge: Susan Illston
2 Judge: PSLC MWD
3 Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2020: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tvnS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #11 Motion to Dismiss. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2020: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tvnS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Hotton. Responses due by 1/27/2020. Replies due by 2/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/9/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPLATED DISMISSAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/9/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 10/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE: re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/7/2019. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L & S Land Co., Albert Laudel, Richard Scardigli (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Mark Hotton. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hotton v. L & S Land Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L & S Land Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Scardigli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Laudel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?