Hornbeck v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Charles Randy Hornbeck
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv05564
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Western District of Arkansas, 6:19-cv-06102-RTD Hornbeck v. Monsanto Company, opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-05564-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 149 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-06102. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to District of District Court for the Northern District of Califonia. (lw)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Monsanto Company for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Keith, Sean)
August 23, 2019 Copy of Docket Sheet and Complaint emailed to panelmdl@jpml.uscourts.gov. (hnc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1969525), filed by Charles Randy Hornbeck.(Keith, Sean)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Charles Randy Hornbeck. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hornbeck v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Randy Hornbeck
Represented By: Sean T. Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?