Mutelet v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Olivia G Mutelet
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv05565
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Southern District of Florida, 9:19-cv-81028-RLR Mutelet v. Monsanto Company, opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-05565-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 149 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:19-cv-81028. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 4, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per DE #5 Conditional Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-149) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL 2741 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #3 Summons Issued. Document Restricted Due to Error; The correct document has been attached to this notice. (vmz)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (vmz) See #4 for image. Modified on text 7/18/2019 (asl).
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11822313, filed by Olivia G Mutelet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Request for Summons Monsanto Company)(Kagan, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mutelet v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia G Mutelet
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?