Torres Murillo v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Olvin Said Torres Murillo
Respondent: Field Office Directo David Jennings, Kevin K. McAleenan, Sheriff Wendell Anderson, William P. Barr and William Barr
Case Number: 3:2019cv05676
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Olvin Said Torres Murillo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 10/23/2019. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/7/2019 10:33:01 AM ]. File Size [ 8304 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:17:18 ]. (courtspeak).
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Motion Hearing Re: [1-2] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on 10/7/2019. Matter is taken under submission. The Court will issue a written order. (FTR Time: 10:33-10:50.) Attorney for Petitioner: Matthew Weisner. Attorney for Respondents: Ellen London. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/7/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 Reply Brief filed by Olvin Said Torres Murillo. (Weisner, Matthew) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Olvin Said Torres Murillo.. (Weisner, Matthew) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION of Exhibit H - Audio Recording (One CD) filed by Wendell Anderson, William Barr, David Jennings, Kevin K. McAleenan. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wendell Anderson, William Barr, David Jennings, Kevin K. McAleenan.. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/27/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Opposition to Motion for TRO byWendell Anderson, William Barr, David Jennings, Kevin K. McAleenan. Traverse due by 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nino Gagelonia, #2 Exhibit A-G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(London, Ellen) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim; granting #5 Stipulation. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen London (London, Ellen) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Olvin Said Torres Murillo. (Weisner, Matthew) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Telephone Conference held on 9/12/2019. Opposition due by 9/23/2019. Reply due by 9/27/2019. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 10/7/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim.Total Time in Court: 8 minutes. Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Matthew Weisner. Defendant Attorney: Ellen Linden. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE - Telephone Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Chambers before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/24/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 First VERIFIED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Immigration Habeas Case), (Filing Fee: $5.00, receipt number 0971-13687778). Filed by Olvin Said Torres Murillo. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Supplement Notice and Motion for TRO, #3 Supplement Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Red Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, Human Rights Report, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, Pet. Immigration Court Filing, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, Pet. Supplemental Immigration Court Filing, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, DOJ Policy, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, Karis v. Sessions, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7, Order and Memorandum of IJ, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8, BIA Filing Receipt, #12 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service, #13 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Weisner, Matthew) (Filed on 9/9/2019) Modified on 9/10/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres Murillo v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Field Office Directo David Jennings
Represented By: Ellen London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Ellen London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Wendell Anderson
Represented By: Ellen London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Ellen London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Olvin Said Torres Murillo
Represented By: Matthew Gilbert Weisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?