Meridian Treatment Services et al v. United Behavioral Health
Plaintiff: HARMONY HOLLYWOOD TREATMENT CENTER, IRECOVER TREATMENT INC and Meridian Treatment Services
Defendant: United Behavioral Health
Case Number: 3:2019cv05721
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Joy Spielman (Spielman, Katie) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Lilienstein (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by United Behavioral Health. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 11/13/2019. Replies due by 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Aaron R. Modiano. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Aaron Modiano (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13746999.) filed by Harmony Hollywood Treatment Center, Irecover Treatment Inc., Meridian Treatment Services. (Liakos, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/27/2019) Modified on 9/30/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/26/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/25/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meridian Treatment Services, Harmony Hollywood Treatment Center, Irecover Treatment Inc.. United Behavioral Health served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Lavin, Matthew) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by United Behavioral Health. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United Behavioral Health.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew M. Lavin representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United Behavioral Health. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 CORRECTED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against United Behavioral Health. Filed by Meridian Treatment Services, Harmony Hollywood Treatment Center, Irecover Treatment Inc. (Liakos, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Matthew M. Lavin (Filing fee $ 310.00, receipt number 0971-13697229.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/12/2019 filed by Harmony Hollywood Treatment Center, Irecover Treatment Inc., Meridian Treatment Services. (Lavin, Matthew) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Liakos, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE DISREGARD*** COMPLAINT against United Behavioral Health (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13695912.). Filed by Meridian Treatment Services, Harmony Hollywood Treatment Center, Irecover Treatment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Liakos, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meridian Treatment Services et al v. United Behavioral Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARMONY HOLLYWOOD TREATMENT CENTER
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRECOVER TREATMENT INC
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meridian Treatment Services
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?