UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund v. Bausch Health Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund and Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
Defendant: Lupin, Ltd., Bausch Health Companies, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SANTARUS, INC., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. and PDL Biopharma, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv06156
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Discovery Hearing held on 4/16/2020. Parties are instructed to meet and confer and file joint letter briefs regarding 227 & 228, by Friday, April 24, 2020. FTR Time: AT&T Conference. Plaintiff Attorneys: Kristen Johnson, David Nalven, John Bjork, Barry Refsin, and Lauren Ravkin all by phone. Defendant Attorneys: Daniel Asimow, Jennifer Patterson, Brendan Coffman, and Eric Stock all by phone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 60 CLERK'S NOTICE Status Conference set for 4/16/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Parties shall appear by phone by dialing 888-684-8852/Access Code 1868782. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
January 9, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 *** DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. *** ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING [re (96 in 3:19-cv-05822-WHA) Letter filed by Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, City of Providence, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund]. One-hour meet-and-confer in Court's jury room at 9:00AM on 1/16/2020. Discovery Hearing set for 1/16/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/9/2020. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2019 Cases associated: Create association to 3:19-cv-05822-WHA. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1; 72 in No. 3:19-cv-05426-WHA; 65 in No. 3:19-cv-05822-WHA; 63 in No. 3:19-cv-05831-WHA; #57 in No. 3:19-cv-06138-WHA; #55 in No. 3:19-cv-06156-WHA; 66 in No. 3:19-cv-06839-WHA; #9 in No. 3:19-cv-07843-WHA. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 57 Statement in Support of Defendants' [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Bausch Health Companies, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 56 Statement in Support of Proposed Scheduling Order by Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Asciolla, Gregory) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Seeking Entry of Amended Proposed Case Management Order No. 1 filed by Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, Santarus, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., PDL Biopharma, Inc., Luipin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Ltd. and Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asciolla, Gregory) (Filed on 12/12/2019) Modified on 12/12/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2019 Filing 54 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/5/19, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporterr Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (64 in 3:19-cv-05426-WHA) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2020. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 9, 2019 Filing 52 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund (Asciolla, Gregory) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/5/2019. New proposed scheduling order and proposed order of consolidation due by 12/12/2019. Discovery begins, effective today, 12/5/2019. Court to issue written order re: appointment of interim counsel. (Total Time in Court: 55 minutes.) Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: A.J. de Bartolomeo (FWK Holdings, LLC & KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.), Steve Shadowen (FWK Holdings, LLC & BI-LO, LLC et al); Joseph Vanek, Lauren Barnes (Meijer, Inc. & Meijer Distribution, Inc.); Whitney Street (City of Providence); Gregory Asciolla (UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund); Sarah DeLoach (KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.). Defendant Attorney: Laura Shores, Daniel Asimow; Eric Stock, Victoria Weatherford (Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.); Jeffrey Bank, Brendan Coffman, Thu Hoang (Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. & Lupin Ltd.); George Gordon (PDL Biopharma, Inc.). Movant Attorney: Anna Neill (Walgreen Co.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE by Bausch Health Companies, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. REGARDING [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the End Payor Class filed by Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Gregory S. Asciolla, #3 Declaration of Whitney E. Street)(Asciolla, Gregory) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jay L. Himes. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice forJay L. Himes ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13940029.) filed by Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Himes, Jay) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Laura S. Shores. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Laura S. Shores ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13938642.) filed by Bausch Health Companies, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Shores, Laura) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Eric J. Stock. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Robin A. van der Meulen. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors, a subsidiary of BlackRock, Inc. for Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Eric J. Stock ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13934142.) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stock, Eric) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, Santarus, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Baush Health Companies, Inc., PDL Biopharma, Inc., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Lupin, Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asciolla, Gregory) (Filed on 11/27/2019) Modified on 12/2/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
November 27, 2019 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund (Asciolla, Gregory) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund (Asciolla, Gregory) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Robin van der Meulen ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13931506.) filed by Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(van der Meulen, Robin) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Colleen Lauren Cleary (Cleary, Colleen) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Carl Nils Hammarskjold (Hammarskjold, Carl) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Todd Anthony Seaver (Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to PDL Biopharma, Inc.. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 33 Proposed Summons. (Asciolla, Gregory) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 32 COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc., PDL Biopharma, Inc.. Filed byUFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund. (Asciolla, Gregory) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jeffrey C. Bank. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Bank ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13913692.) filed by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin, Ltd.. (Bank, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin, Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Other Affiliate Lupin Inc. for Lupin, Ltd.; Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Corporate Parent Lupin Inc. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin, Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Other Affiliate Lupin Inc. for Lupin, Ltd.; Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Corporate Parent Lupin Inc. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of Plaintiff UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund (Asciolla, Gregory) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on Behalf of Defendants Bausch Health Companies, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Santarus, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bausch Health Companies, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bausch Health Companies Inc. for Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Saul P. Morgenstern on Behalf of Defendants Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Santarus, Inc. (Morgenstern, Saul) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Asimow on Behalf of Defendants Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Santarus, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Lynn Devine (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING CMC: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 1/02/2020 11:00 AM is rescheduled to 12/5/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Ethan H. Kaminsky. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ethan H. Kaminsky ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13838056.) filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kaminsky, Ethan) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/29/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE that case C-19-6156-WHA is NOT related to case C-09-5587-PJH. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory S. Asciolla. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Bausch Health Companies, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. of Filings Regarding Administrative Motions to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Gregory S. Asciolla ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13812788.) filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Asciolla, Gregory) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS [CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1(a)] filed by Bausch Health Companies, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING THE CMC ON REASSIGNMENT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 12/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/2/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's we page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/4/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 10/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.. (Hammarskjold, Carl) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13746235.). Filed byUFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 9/27/2019) Modified on 10/1/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/1/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund v. Bausch Health Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin, Ltd.
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Devine
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bausch Health Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Saul P. Morgenstern
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Devine
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Saul P. Morgenstern
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Saul P. Morgenstern
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTARUS, INC.
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Saul P. Morgenstern
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Victoria Leigh Weatherford
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDL Biopharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund
Represented By: Todd Anthony Seaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Todd Anthony Seaver
Represented By: Colleen Lauren Cleary
Represented By: Carl Nils Hammarskjold
Represented By: Gregory Asciolla
Represented By: Ethan H. Kaminsky
Represented By: Jay L. Himes
Represented By: Robin van der Meulen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Gregory Asciolla
Represented By: Jay L. Himes
Represented By: Robin van der Meulen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?