Ista et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Richard Ista and Diane Ista
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv06185
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 3, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; District of North Dakota, 3:19-cv-00191 Ista v. Monsanto, opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-06185-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 153 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of North Dakota; Case Number 3:19-cv-00191. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-153) (certified copy) transferring case to Northern District of California to be included in MDL Docket No. 2741. Case transferred via ECF extract civil case feature. (pb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (lf) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/12/2019 to add color court seal) (lf).
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000504) filed by Richard Ista, Diane Ista. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ista et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ista
Represented By: Mike J Miller
Represented By: Todd Michael Miller
Represented By: Mike J Miller,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Ista
Represented By: Mike J Miller
Represented By: Todd Michael Miller
Represented By: Mike J Miller,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?