Poudyal v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Bharat Poudyal
Defendant: Secretary USDHS Kevin McAleenan, US Attorney General William Barr, John Kramar, Kenneth T. Cuccineli, William Barr and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 3:2019cv06233
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bharat Poudyal.. (Haq, Maleeha) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/20/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bharat Poudyal re #6 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint, (Haq, Maleeha) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccineli, John Kramar, Kevin McAleenan, (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 5, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Haq, Maleeha) (Filed on 10/5/2019)
October 4, 2019 #Electronic filing error re: #4 Proposed Summons filed by Bharat Poudyal. Incorrect format. Please re-file in its entirety using form AO 440 found on the Court's website h ttps://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Haq, Maleeha) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus against William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccineli, John Kramar, Kevin McAleenan (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13755864). Filed by Bharat Poudyal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haq, Maleeha) (Filed on 10/1/2019) Modified on 10/2/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poudyal v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary USDHS Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kramar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccineli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bharat Poudyal
Represented By: Maleeha Haq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?