Thompson v. Mendez et al
Plaintiff: Tracey N. Thompson
Defendant: Al Kerzinan and Julio Mendez
Case Number: 3:2019cv06247
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 USCA Referral Notice as to #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Tracey N. Thompson. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 USCA Case Number 19-17368 for #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Tracey N. Thompson. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019) (USCA Case No.19-17368)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Tracey N. Thompson. (IFP Request was previously filed with the Court). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT for defendants and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/13/2019. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lsS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/13/2019. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lsS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Letter regarding change of venue from Tracy N. Thompson. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tracey N. Thompson.. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Screening Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Amended complaint due by 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Declination Form) (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2019: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/31/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tracey N. Thompson. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019) Modified on 10/2/2019 (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 Letter, "Facts and Letter to The Judge," from Tracey N. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Mendez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Kerzinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey N. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?