Aabbott v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Douglas Aabbott
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv06267
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741 VC; Middle District of Florida (Orlando), 6:19-cv-01674 WWB GJK, Aabbott v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-06267 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 154 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:19-cv-01674. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: 2741 (MAA)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Douglas Aabbott. Related case(s): yes (Petosa, Frank)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Douglas Aabbott. (Petosa, Frank)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number MDL-2741, In re: Roundup Product Liability Litigation. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 9/16/2019, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Docket, #2 Complaint) (MAA)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/13/2019. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/13/2019. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (MAA)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-1674-Orl-78GJK. (SJB)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15852088) filed by Douglas Aabbott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Petosa, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aabbott v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Aabbott
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Represented By: Frank Michael Petosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?