Nessmith et al v. Altria Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Erin Nessmith and Jared Nessmith
Defendant: Altria Group Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc, JUUL Labs Inc, Juul Labs Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Adam Bowen, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Riaz Valani, Altria Enterprises, LLC, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, Tobacco Technology, Inc., eLIQUITECH, INC and eLiquitech, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv06344
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 47 Summons Issued as to Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises, LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc, Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLIQUITECH, INC. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 46 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Defendants)(Haberman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Altria Group Inc., Juul Labs Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc. Filed byErin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith. (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 44 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 14, 2020, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (376 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (375 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (371 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (374 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (373 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2020. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Paul W. Rodney. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Andrew McCormick on behalf of Defendants Altria Group, Inc. and Philip Morris USA Inc. (McCormick, Sean) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Paul W. Rodney) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14091117.) Filing fee previously paid on January 21, 2020 filed by Altria Group Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Paul W. Rodney)(McCormick, Sean) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
December 16, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE by Erin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith Of Filing Additional Documents In Support Of Their Motion For Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 48, #2 Exhibit 49, #3 Exhibit 50, #4 Exhibit 51, #5 Exhibit 52)(Schlesinger, Scott) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE by JUUL Labs Inc re 51 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Shorten Time (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 38 Statement Pursuant to Court Order [DE 51] by Erin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Exhibit B)(Schlesinger, Scott) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Shorten Time For Hearing and Briefing Schedule on JLI's Motion to Enforce Pretrial Order #1 filed by JUUL Labs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Schwing In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION To Enforce Pretrial Order #1 filed by JUUL Labs Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2019 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/15/2019. Replies due by 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Schwing In Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 4, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Florida Middle, 8:19-cv-00884-MSS-AAS, Nessmith et al., v. Altria Group, Inc., et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-6344-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO October 1,2019 cc: JPMDL (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:19-cv-00884. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 3, 2019 Filing 34 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel transfer order transferring case to: Northern District of California re: MDL case number: 2913. (AG)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #31 Defendants' Request to Defer Briefing and Hearing of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Until After Resolution of Pending Motion to Transfer or Stay or, Alternatively, Forthcoming Motion to Transfer to Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/8/2019. (APF)
August 2, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to transfer case or MOTION to stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #31 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Defendants' Request to Defer Briefing and Hearing of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction until After Resolution of Pending Motion to Transfer or Stay or, Alternatively, Forthcoming Moti filed by Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief in Support of Juul Labs' Motion to Transfer Related Cases for Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings, #2 Exhibit Order on Juul Labs' Motion to Transfer or Stay, #3 Exhibit California Complaint (Boyens v. Juul Labs, et. al.))(Schifino, William)
July 29, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Defendants' Request to Defer Briefing and Hearing of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction until After Resolution of Pending Motion to Transfer or Stay or, Alternatively, Forthcoming Motion to Transfer to Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schifino, William)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #27 Defendant Juul Labs, Inc.'s Amended Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Transfer or Stay; DENYING AS MOOT #26 Defendant Juul Labs, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Further Support of its Motion to Transfer or Stay, in light of the amended filing. Defendant shall have up to and including seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a Reply, which shall not exceed five (5) pages. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/26/2019. (APF)
July 24, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for preliminary injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Erin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit Erin NesSmith, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Judith Prochaska, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Bonnie Halpern-Felsher, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberman, Jeffrey)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING AS STATED HEREIN #22 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants' deadline to file their answers or otherwise respond to the Complaint and the Parties' obligations under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16 and 26, Local Rule 3.05, and the Court's April 17, 2019 Related Case Order and Track Two Notice are CONTINUED until such time as the Court provides the Parties with further direction. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/6/2019. (APF)
June 4, 2019 Filing 27 Amended MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer or Stay with Updated Local Rule 3.01(g) Certificate by Juul Labs, Inc. (LeMieux, George)
June 4, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer or Stay by Juul Labs, Inc. (LeMieux, George)
May 31, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Erin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to transfer case or MOTION to stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Erin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney G. Charles Nierlich, appearing on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056676.). (JCG)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 motion to appear pro hac vice. G. Charles Nierlich may appear pro hac vice if he complies with Local Rule 2.01(d)'s fee and email registration requirements by June 3, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 5/20/2019. (DMP)
May 17, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint by Juul Labs, Inc. (Schifino, William)
May 17, 2019 Filing 21 JOINDER in motion by Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. re #20 MOTION to transfer case or MOTION to stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Juul Labs, Inc. (Michael, Geoffrey)
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to transfer case or MOTION to stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Juul Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of G. Charles Nierlich, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Danna McKay)(Schifino, William)
May 17, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for G. Charles Nierlich to appear pro hac vice by Juul Labs, Inc. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
May 17, 2019 Filing 18 TERMINATED, Special Admission Certification form not to be filed electronically.***CERTIFICATE of counsel G. Charles Nierlich by William J. Schifino, Jr. on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Schifino, William) Modified text and image on 5/20/2019 (LNR).
May 8, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Juul Labs, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Lexington Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Altria Group, Inc., Other Affiliate RSUI Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Gemini Insurance Company, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, PA., Other Affiliate Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Other Affiliate Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Co., Other Affiliate RSG Underwriting Managers Europe Limited t/a Startpoint, Other Affiliate Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Syndicate 3624, Other Affiliate Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Syndicate 2623/623 for Juul Labs, Inc... (Schifino, William)
May 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Juul Labs, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Schifino, William)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #10 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, and for Shortened Response Period. Defendants shall have up to and including June 12, 2019 to file their answers or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Defendants' request for a shortened response period is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/1/2019. (APF)
May 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Erin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith. Related case(s): yes (Haberman, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Erin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Erin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Jonathan Michael on behalf of Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. (Michael, Geoffrey)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and For Shortened Response Period by All Defendants. (Schifino, William)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Philip Morris USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Philip Morris USA, Inc. (Michael, Geoffrey)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Altria Group, Inc. (Michael, Geoffrey)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Schifino, Jr. on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Schifino, William)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by George S. LeMieux on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (LeMieux, George)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/17/2019. (KTT)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/17/2019. (KTT)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. (LNR)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-884-T-35AAS. (SJB)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., JUUL Labs, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15351750) filed by Erin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Haberman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nessmith et al v. Altria Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Inc.
Represented By: William J. Schifino, Jr.
Represented By: Geoffrey Jonathan Michael
Represented By: Sean Andrew McCormick
Represented By: Paul W. Rodney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA Inc
Represented By: William J. Schifino, Jr.
Represented By: Geoffrey Jonathan Michael
Represented By: Sean Andrew McCormick
Represented By: Paul W. Rodney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs Inc
Represented By: George S. LeMieux
Represented By: William J. Schifino, Jr.
Represented By: George Charles Nierlich
Represented By: Austin Van Schwing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs Inc.
Represented By: George S. LeMieux
Represented By: William J. Schifino, Jr.
Represented By: George Charles Nierlich
Represented By: Austin Van Schwing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLane Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Monsees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eby-Brown Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Client Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riaz Valani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternative Ingredients, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyoung Huh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobacco Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eLIQUITECH, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eLiquitech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Nessmith
Represented By: Jonathan Robert Gdanski
Represented By: Scott Schlesinger
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Represented By: Scott P Schlesinger
Represented By: Scott P. Schlesinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Louis Haberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Nessmith
Represented By: Jonathan Robert Gdanski
Represented By: Scott Schlesinger
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Represented By: Scott P Schlesinger
Represented By: Scott P. Schlesinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Louis Haberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?