LaPadula v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Jack LaPadula
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv06391
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 2:19-cv-14294. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 4, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per DE #10 Conditional Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-155) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL 2741 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jack LaPadula re #3 Summons Issued (Petosa, Frank)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING #6 Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. Plaintiff did not list the correct Defendant. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/10/2019. (kml)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Jack LaPadula (Petosa, Frank)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jack LaPadula identifying Other Affiliate Morgan & Morgan, P.A. for Jack LaPadula (Petosa, Frank)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Katherine Chambers, mailing date August 20, 2019, (pt)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (drz)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11916335, filed by Jack LaPadula. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons Monsanto Company)(Morgan, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaPadula v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack LaPadula
Represented By: Frank Michael Petosa
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Represented By: Katherine Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?