Turner et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Bruce Turner and Judy Turner
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv06392
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-01722. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 4, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (dlw)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER - This case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel on 10/3/2019 and certified by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California 10/4/2019. (dlw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Judy Turner, Bruce Turner. Monsanto Company served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Bifferato, Ian)
September 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 13, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Monsanto Company on 9/13/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Monsanto Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2730321.) - filed by Judy Turner, Bruce Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Turner
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Turner
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?