Hancock et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Lamar Hancock and Sandra Hancock
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv06424
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-02496. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-155) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL re #3 Summons Returned Executed, by Plaintiffs Lamar Hancock, Sandra Hancock. (Adler, Enrique)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Lamar Hancock, Sandra Hancock. Monsanto Company served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Adler, Enrique)[Attorney filing error. This return of summons executed does not include a copy of the summons that signed/sealed/issued by the Clerk of Court on 9/6/2019. Attorney notified of filing error and instructed to file a supplement to this document. Modified on 9/10/2019 (MRC)]
September 6, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Enrique Elliot Adler. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Charles A. Shaw. (BAK)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Lamar Hancock, Sandra Hancock Process Server: HPS Process Service and Investigations (BAK)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Demand For Jury Trial against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7442801, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Lamar Hancock, Sandra Hancock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Attachment Notice Of Intent To Use Process Server)(Adler, Enrique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar Hancock
Represented By: Enrique Elliot Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Hancock
Represented By: Enrique Elliot Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?