Jilk v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Jilk
Defendant: John Does 1 through 100, inclusive and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv06429
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-02443. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-155) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kenneth Jilk. Monsanto Company served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Kirk, Emily)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 29, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Emily Jo Kirk . All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG) Modified on 8/29/2019 (MFG).
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Kenneth Jilk Process Server: Civil Action Group dba APS International (MFG)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT [Summons to be issued] against defendant All Defendants Jury Demand,, filed by Kenneth Jilk.(Kirk, Emily)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number MOEDC-7427567, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Kenneth Jilk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Form Notice of Intent to Use Process Server, #3 Original Filing Form)(Kirk, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jilk v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Jilk
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?