Hacker v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Brenda Hacker
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv06432
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00611. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California MDL case number: 2741 (laf)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Brenda Hacker. (Chambers, G.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/18/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/4/2019. (jmc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 9/3/19, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint) (drn)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/3/2019. (drn)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSFER IN from Tampa Division on 08/26/2019 Case Number 8:19-cv-2039. Case assigned to District Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New Case Number: 2:19-cv-611-FtM-38MRM. (drn)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Brenda Hacker. Related case(s): yes (Chambers, G.)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER: On August 16, 2019, the Court directed Hacker to show cause by August 21, 2019, why this action should not be transferred to the Fort Myers Division of the Middle District of Florida pursuant to Local Rule 1.02(c). (Doc. # 3). Yet, that date has passed and Hacker has not responded to the Court's order to show cause. The Court interprets Hacker's failure to respond as an admission that this case should have been filed in the Fort Myers Division. Indeed, given that Hacker resides in Hendry County, Florida, and was exposed to Roundup in Hendry County, this case should have been filed in the Fort Myers Division pursuant to Local Rule 1.02(c). See Local Rule 1.02(c)("All civil proceedings of any kind shall be instituted in that Division encompassing the county or counties having the greatest nexus with the cause, giving due regard to the place where the claim arose and the residence or principal place of business of the parties."). Accordingly, the Court directs the Clerk to transfer this case to the Fort Myers Division. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/23/2019. (DMD)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/20/2019. (TWL)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/20/2019. (TWL)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (LNR)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER: In the Complaint, Hacker states that venue is proper in this Court because Hacker's injury occurred and was diagnosed in this District. (Doc. #1 at 2). However, the Complaint also states that Hacker resides in Hendry County, Florida, and was exposed to Roundup in Hendry County. (Id.). Hendry County is located in the Fort Myers Division of the Middle District of Florida. Accordingly, Hacker is directed to show cause by August 21, 2019, why this action should not be transferred to the Fort Myers Division pursuant to Local Rule 1.02(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/16/2019. (DMD)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-2039-T-33CPT. (SJB)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15812496) filed by Brenda Hacker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chambers, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hacker v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Hacker
Represented By: Genevieve Katherine Chambers
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?