Soule et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Bryan Soule and Peggy Sue Soule
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv06437
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00656. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California MDL case number: 2741 (laf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2741, Information emailed to MDL Panel on 9/9/19, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (MLS)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/9/2019. (MLS)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (MLS)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-656-FtM-60NPM. (SJB)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15891011) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kagan, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soule et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Soule
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Represented By: Andrew T. Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Sue Soule
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Represented By: Andrew T. Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?