Chandler v. Allison et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Tyrell Chandler
Defendant: Sara Gates, M. Felder, Diaz and Kathleen Allison
Case Number: 3:2019cv06452
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Referring Judge: Edward M Chen
2 Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anthony Tyrell Chandler. (Attachments: #1 certificate)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony Tyrell Chandler.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Request from Anthony Tyrell Chandler dated 10/16/19 a copy of complaint and exhibits and Order granting library access at least twice a week. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019) Modified on 10/31/2019 (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Event changed from a letter to a motion) Modified text on 10/31/2019, (to conform with document.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/15/2019. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kathleen Allison, Diaz, M. Felder, Sara Gates. Filed by Anthony Tyrell Chandler. Consent/Declination due by 11/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. Allison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Tyrell Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?