Boyer et al v. Universal Protection Service, LP et al
Plaintiff: Michael Boyer and Johnny Boyer
Defendant: Universal Protection Service, LP and Save Mart Supermarkets
Case Number: 3:2019cv06481
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Johnny Boyer, Michael Boyer of Settlement (Kent, Ayse) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Remand) filed by Universal Protection Service, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mindy Grinde in Suppot of Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mindy Grinde in Suppot of Opposition to Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Mindy Grinde in Suppot of Opposition to Motion to Remand, #4 Declaration of Ace Tate in Support of Opposition to Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Ace Tate in Support of Opposition to Motion to Remand, #6 Declaration of Rachael Moroski in Support of Opposition to Motion to Remand)(Tate, Ace) (Filed on 11/18/2019) Modified on 11/19/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Scott Cowie (Cowie, Paul) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE: Filing party set the motion for hearing on a day the Court is unavailable. Motion Hearing #16 MOTION to Remand set for 12/26/2019 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 1/16/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Briefing remains unchanged. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2020 is moved to same date and time as motion hearing. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand filed by Johnny Boyer, Michael Boyer. Motion Hearing set for 12/26/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/19/2019. Replies due by 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ayse Kent, #2 Proposed Order)(Kent, Ayse) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/31/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ayse Kent (Kent, Ayse) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Universal Protection Service, LP.. (Tate, Ace) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Save Mart Supermarkets (Moroski, Rachel) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, by Save Mart Supermarkets. (Moroski, Rachel) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Universal Protection Service, LP re #7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, and Brochure re Consenting to the Jurisdiction of a Majistrate Judge (Naftel, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 1/ 2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Universal Protection Service, LP re: Standing Orders and New Case Documents (Naftel, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/23/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Universal Protection Service, LP (Naftel, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Universal Protection Service, LP . (Tate, Ace) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filin gs > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Universal Protection Service, LP re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, (Tate, Ace) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1331, 1367, 1441, 1446 from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-57559. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13778483). Filed byUniversal Protection Service, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ace T. Tate in Support of Defendant Universal Protection Service LP's Notice of Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Ace T. Tate in Support of Defendant Universal Protection Service LP's Notice of Removal of Action, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Ace T. Tate in Support of Defendant Universal Protection Service LP's Notice of Removal of Action, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Ace T. Tate in Support of Defendant Universal Protection Service LP's Notice of Removal of Action, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of Ace T. Tate in Support of Defendant Universal Protection Service LP's Notice of Removal of Action, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration of Ace T. Tate in Support of Defendant Universal Protection Service LP's Notice of Removal of Action, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration of Ace T. Tate in Support of Defendant Universal Protection Service LP's Notice of Removal of Action)(Tate, Ace) (Filed on 10/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyer et al v. Universal Protection Service, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Protection Service, LP
Represented By: Ace Thomas Tate
Represented By: Jeremy T. Naftel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Save Mart Supermarkets
Represented By: Paul Scott Cowie
Represented By: Rachel Jan Moroski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Boyer
Represented By: Ayse Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Boyer
Represented By: Ayse Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?