Abdulaziz v. Twitter, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Omar Abdulaziz
Defendant: McKinsey&Co. and Twitter, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv06694
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by McKinsey&Co.. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 12/30/2019. Replies due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Duffy in Support of Defendant McKinsey and Company, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Vikram Dastidar in Support of Defendant McKinsey and Company, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration of Mark David McPherson in Support of Defendant McKinsey and Company, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant McKinsey and Company, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(McPherson, Mark) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 27 Request for Judicial Notice re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Twitter, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 12/30/2019. Replies due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rylee K. Olm, #2 Exhibit A to Olm Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Olm Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Olm Decl., #5 Declaration of Twitter employee, #6 Exhibit 1 to Twitter employee Decl., #7 Exhibit 2 to Twitter employee Decl., #8 Exhibit 3 to Twitter employee Decl., #9 Exhibit 4 to Twitter employee Decl., #10 Proposed Order to Motion to Dismiss and Request for Judicial Notice)(Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 25 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anjali Srinivasan, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Motion to Dismiss - Redacted, #4 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Motion to Dismiss - UNDER SEAL, #5 Declaration of Rylee K. Olm - Redacted, #6 Declaration of Rylee K. Olm - UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit C to Olm Declaration - UNDER SEAL, #8 Declaration of Twitter Employee - Redacted, #9 Declaration of Twitter Employee - UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 3 to Twitter Employee Declaration - UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 4 to Twitter Employee Declaration - UNDER SEAL, #12 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 1/16/2020 is reset to 2/13/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference ) filed byOmar Abdulaziz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Kleiman in Support)(Kleiman, Mark) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Twitter, Inc.. Responses due by 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Berkowitz, #2 Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by McKinsey&Co... (McPherson, Mark) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Twitter, Inc... (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/22/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by McKinsey&Co. Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (McPherson, Mark) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark David McPherson (McPherson, Mark) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Defendants Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Twitter, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement and Disclosure of Interested Entities (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Rylee Kercher Olm (Olm, Rylee) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anjali Srinivasan (Srinivasan, Anjali) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Khari Jamil Tillery (Tillery, Khari) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Berkowitz (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Omar Abdulaziz.. (Kleiman, Mark) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Omar Abdulaziz. McKinsey&Co. served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Kleiman, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Omar Abdulaziz. Twitter, Inc. served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Kleiman, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to McKinsey&Co., Twitter, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Kleiman, Mark) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Behnam Gharagozli (Gharagozli, Behnam) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Omar Abdulaziz (Kleiman, Mark) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/1/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against McKinsey&Co., Twitter, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13804844.). Filed byOmar Abdulaziz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kleiman, Mark) (Filed on 10/18/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdulaziz v. Twitter, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey&Co.
Represented By: Mark David McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Khari Jamil Tillery
Represented By: Benjamin Berkowitz
Represented By: Anjali Srinivasan
Represented By: Rylee Kercher Olm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Abdulaziz
Represented By: Mark Allen Kleiman
Represented By: Behnam Gharagozli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?