Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Calstate Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California and Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Calstate Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv06874
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. Calstate Construction, Inc. served on 12/7/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Calstate Construction, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/31/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California.. (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/5/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Collective Bargaining Agreement; to Recover Unpaid Trust Fund Contributions; and for a Mandatory Injunction against Calstate Construction, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13814996.). Filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Richman, Ronald) (Filed on 10/22/2019) Modified on 10/29/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Calstate Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Represented By: Sarah Kyong-Ju Lee Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calstate Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?