Griffin v. Saul
Plaintiff: Samantha Griffin
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv07045
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed in a Social Security Case Andrew M. Saul served on 12/3/2019, answer due 3/2/2020. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Receipt re #6 Summons Issued. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew M. Saul.. (Tomaselli, Gina) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Samantha Griffin. (Bruce, Charles) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security against Andrew M. Saul (Filing Fee IFPP). Filed by Samantha Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bruce, Charles) (Filed on 10/28/2019) Modified on 10/30/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Griffin
Represented By: Charles Lee Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Gina Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?