WhatsApp Inc. et al v. NSO Group Technologies Limited et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs WhatsApp Inc. and Facebook, Inc. alleged that Defendants NSO Group Technologies Ltd. and Q Cyber Technologies Ltd. used WhatsApp servers to send malware to approximately 1,400 mobile phones and devices for the purpose of conducting surveillance of specific WhatsApp users. These targeted users included attorneys, journalists, human rights activists, political dissidents, diplomats and other senior foreign government officials from the Kingdom of Bahrain, the United Arab Emirates and Mexico. Plaintiff seeks injunctive relief and damages under the Computer Fraud and Abuse Act, 18 USC § 1030, the California Comprehensive Computer Data Access and Fraud Act, California Penal Code § 502, and for breach of contract and trespass to chattels.

Plaintiff: Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc.
Defendant: NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited
Case Number: 3:2019cv07123
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING TIME OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Due to the Court's trial schedule, the initial case management conference scheduled for 1/30/2020 shall commence at 3:00 p.m., in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook Inc., WhatsApp Inc... (LeBlanc, Travis) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Christopher Wong (Wong, Kyle) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel J. Grooms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/2/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/30/2020 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to NSO Group Technologies Limited, Q Cyber Technologies Limited. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Douglas Mornin for Plaintiffs WhatsApp Inc. and Facebook, Inc. (Mornin, Joseph) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel J. Grooms ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13838792.) filed by Facebook Inc., WhatsApp Inc.. (Grooms, Daniel) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Inc., WhatsApp Inc. (LeBlanc, Travis) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WhatsApp Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Facebook Inc. for WhatsApp Inc.. (LeBlanc, Travis) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook Inc. (LeBlanc, Travis) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (LeBlanc, Travis) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NSO Group Technologies Limited, Q Cyber Technologies Limited ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13834740.). Filed byFacebook Inc., WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 11, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LeBlanc, Travis) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NSO Group Technologies Limited, Q Cyber Technologies Limited ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13834740.). Filed byFacebook Inc., WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 through 11, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LeBlanc, Travis) (Filed on 10/29/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WhatsApp Inc. et al v. NSO Group Technologies Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Travis LeBlanc
Represented By: Kyle Christopher Wong
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Grooms
Represented By: Joseph Douglas Mornin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WhatsApp Inc.
Represented By: Travis LeBlanc
Represented By: Kyle Christopher Wong
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Grooms
Represented By: Joseph Douglas Mornin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSO Group Technologies Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q Cyber Technologies Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?