Molina-Martinez v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Diana Molina-Martinez
Defendant: Department of the Army, Matthew Keaton Dorais and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv07147
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Molina-Martinez (Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Molina-Martinez (Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Molina-Martinez (Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Molina-Martinez (Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Diana Molina-Martinez.. (Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/27/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Department of the Army, Matthew Keaton Dorais, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2019. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13837183.). Filed byDiana Molina-Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wolden, Kirk) (Filed on 10/29/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina-Martinez v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Keaton Dorais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Molina-Martinez
Represented By: Kirk J. Wolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?