Hitler v. County of Alameda
Plaintiff: Carl A.R. Hitler, Jr. and Carl Renowitzky
Defendant: County of Alameda
Case Number: 3:2019cv07160
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC MWD
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 1/13/2020. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 1/13/2020. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notices #2 , #3 sent to Carl Renowitzky returned as undeliverable ("Need Inmates PFN To Process"). Mail Returned; response required by 1/24/2020. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2019: #1 Instructions for Filing an IFP Application) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/4/2019 (ljf, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 12/9/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 12/9/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT PETITION FOR ASSAULT & BATTERY AGAINST EVILDOERS WHO CRIMINALLY OBSTRUCTED JUSTICE; (NO PROCESS);(IFP PENDING); against County of Alameda. Filed byCarl A.R. Hitler Jr. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2019: #1 Envelope) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2019: #2 Complaint) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitler v. County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl A.R. Hitler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Renowitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?