Ashe v. Saul
Plaintiff: Julie Ashe
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv07180
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Sachelari, Paul) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Julie Ashe.. (Shaffer, Andrew) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Andrew Saul on 11/01/2019, filed by Julie Ashe. (Shaffer, Andrew) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendant Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER (Social Security Review Action)(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/14/2019. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Shaffer, Andrew) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security (Administrative Procedure Act Case) against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13841753). Filed by Julie Ashe. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaffer, Andrew) (Filed on 10/30/2019) Modified on 10/31/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashe v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Paul Sachelari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ashe
Represented By: Andrew Kenneth Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?