InnoBrilliance, LLC v. Hubb Systems, LLC
Plaintiff: InnoBrilliance, LLC
Defendant: Hubb Systems, LLC and Broadcast Microwave Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv07244
Filed: November 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Hubb Systems, LLC Only filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 Summons on First Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendant Broadcast Microwave Services, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Broadcast Microwave Services, Inc.. Filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defendant Hubb Systems, LLC. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 2, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/18/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2019)
November 2, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 11/2/2019)
November 2, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 11/2/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2019: #1 complaint for patent infringement) (tnS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 11/2/2019)
November 2, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 11/2/2019)
November 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Jury Trial Demanded against Hubb Systems, LLC, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971- 13850452). Filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Exhibit C)(Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 11/2/2019) Modified on 11/4/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InnoBrilliance, LLC v. Hubb Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubb Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadcast Microwave Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InnoBrilliance, LLC
Represented By: Isaac P. Rabicoff
Represented By: Steven Anton Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?