Ironshore Indeminty, Inc. v. YRC INC.
Plaintiff: Ironshore Indeminty, Inc.
Defendant: YRC INC. dba YRC FREIGHT and YRC, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv07267
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ironshore Indeminty, Inc... (Fant, Philip) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/20/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by YRC, INC... (Jeffries, Kathleen) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by YRC, INC. identifying Corporate Parent YRC Worldwide, Inc. for YRC, INC.. re #8 Answer to Complaint (Jeffries, Kathleen) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint byYRC, INC.. (Jeffries, Kathleen) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/4/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to YRC, INC.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/19/2019. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ironshore Indeminty, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group for Ironshore Indeminty, Inc.. (Fant, Philip) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Fant, Philip) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against YRC INC. dba YRC FREIGHT ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13854532.). Filed byIronshore Indeminty, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civl Cover Sheet)(Fant, Philip) (Filed on 11/4/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ironshore Indeminty, Inc. v. YRC INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironshore Indeminty, Inc.
Represented By: Philip A. Fant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC INC. dba YRC FREIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC, INC.
Represented By: Kathleen Collins Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?