Markarian v. Page et al
Plaintiff: Harry Markarian
Defendant: Larry Page, Alan R. Mulally, Diane B. Greene, Alphabet Inc., Ruth M. Porat, John L. Hennessy, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Ann Mather, Sergey Brin, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, L. John Doerr, Robin L. Washington and Sundar Pichai
Interested Party: William Wessels
Case Number: 3:2019cv07291
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for January 30, 2020 is continued to September 24, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by September 17, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE (36 in 3:19-cv-07291-RS) (20 in 3:19-cv-06880-RS) Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/2/20. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 27, 2019 Filing 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Setting Briefing Schedule filed by William Wessels. (Wedeking, Steven) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harry Markarian. Service waived by Eric E. Schmidt waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harry Markarian. Service waived by Robin L. Washington waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harry Markarian. Service waived by Diane B. Greene waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harry Markarian. Service waived by K. Ram Shriram waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harry Markarian. Service waived by Alan R. Mulally waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harry Markarian. Service waived by Ann Mather waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harry Markarian. Service waived by Roger W. Ferguson, Jr. waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harry Markarian. Service waived by L. John Doerr waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harry Markarian. Service waived by John L. Hennessy waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harry Markarian. Service waived by Ruth M. Porat waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harry Markarian. Service waived by Sundar Pichai waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harry Markarian. Service waived by Sergey Brin waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harry Markarian. Service waived by Larry Page waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harry Markarian. Service waived by Alphabet Inc. waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an in-person Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom #3, 17th Floor, in San Francisco before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2020. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. If either party so desires, however, counsel may file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am, in which case the Conference will be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically for all parties, and all parties must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding defendants' administrative motion to consider whether cases should be related. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/10/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings re Order Relating Cases. Judge Edward J. Davila no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl Weisbard Foung (Foung, Cheryl) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Application for Admission of Attorey Pro Hac Vice for Gideon A. Schor, Counsel for Defendants. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Gideon A. Schor ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13947302.) filed by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Robin L. Washington. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Schor, Gideon) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for discovery matters. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY***SEE DOCKET 12 ***CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Robin L. Washington.. (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Robin L. Washington (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Feldman , Benjamin M. Crosson, and Stephen B. Strain (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for all further proceedings re #5 Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Robin L. Washington. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/5/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/19/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Harry Markarian (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Robin L. Washington ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13859134.). Filed byHarry Markarian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 11/5/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markarian v. Page et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Page
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan R. Mulally
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane B. Greene
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth M. Porat
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Hennessy
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger W. Ferguson, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Mather
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergey Brin
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric E. Schmidt
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Ram Shriram
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. John Doerr
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin L. Washington
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundar Pichai
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Strain
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Markarian
Represented By: Conrad Brandon Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William Wessels
Represented By: Steven Ray Wedeking, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?