Jenus v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Jenus
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc. and PAX Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv07319
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 14, 2020, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (376 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (375 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (371 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (374 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (373 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2020. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by James Gotz. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13986241.) filed by Jonathan Jenus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Admission and Good Standing)(Gotz, James) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Jonathan Jenus. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JUUL Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 7, 2019 DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: Jenus v. Juul Labs, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-7319-WHO cc: JPMDL (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jonathan Jenus (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JUUL Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13865456.). Filed byJonathan Jenus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 11/7/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenus v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAX Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Jenus
Represented By: Bonny E. Sweeney
Represented By: James Daniel Gotz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?