GLUCH v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Gluch
Defendant: Does 1-10, Phillip Morris USA, Inc., Altria Group Inc., Juul Labs, Inc. and PAX Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv07325
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-04821. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 31, 2019 Original record transferred to the Northern District of California via interdistrict transfer system. (md)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Transfer Order (CTO 4) that Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MultidistrictLitigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 2, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable William H. Orrick, III. (rf, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by JASON GLUCH Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action (RELKIN, ELLEN)
October 16, 2019 Four Summonses Issued as to ALTRIA GROUP, INC., JUUL LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC., PHILLIP MORRIS, USA, INC.. Forwarded To: ELLEN RELKIN, ESQ. on 10/17/2019 (dmc, )
October 16, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JASON GLUCH. (dmc, ) Modified on 10/17/2019 (nd, ).
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALTRIA GROUP, INC., DOES 1-10, JUUL LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC., PHILLIP MORRIS, USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE205319.), filed by JASON GLUCH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(dmc, ) Modified on 10/17/2019 (nd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLUCH v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Morris USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAX Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Gluch
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?