Long v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jairus Long
Defendant: JUUL Labs Inc, Altria Group Inc. and Pax Labs Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv07336
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04642. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-6) from the MDL Panel transferring this action to the USDC for the Northern District of California for inclusion in MDL 2913. (ddm)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/22/19. (bnw)
October 18, 2019 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons approved by JPB. (bnw)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(rjs)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jairus Long. (rjs)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9009452) filed by Jairus Long. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jairus Long
Represented By: Rachel Soffin
Represented By: Mark E Silvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pax Labs Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?