Alatorre v. Blazin Wings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hector Alatorre
Defendant: Blazin Wings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv07405
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/06/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 01/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RELATING CASE TO 3:19cv4608-WHO. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/02/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byHector Alatorre. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 19--cv--04608--WHO. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 19, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar re #14 .(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Permit Plaintiff Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re #7 Stipulation filed by Blazin Wings, Inc. and Hector Alatorre. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Woods, Noah) (Filed on 12/16/2019) Modified on 12/17/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 12/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hector Alatorre.. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Blazin Wings, Inc.. Filed by Hector Alatorre. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/13/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1 filed by Blazin Wings, Inc.. (Woods, Noah) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Joint Case Management Statement du e by 2/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Khatereh Sage Fahimi on behalf of Defendant Blazin Wings, Inc. (Fahimi, Khatereh) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Eileen James on behalf of Defendant Blazin Wings, Inc. (James, Stacey) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Blazin Wings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc. for Blazin Wings, Inc.. (Woods, Noah) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1331, 1332, 1441 and 1446 from Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-19-579520, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13871249). Filed by Blazin Wings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Proof of Service), #3 Exhibit C (Notice of CMC), #4 Declaration Declaration of Woods, #5 Declaration Declaration of Link, #6 Declaration Declaration of Miller, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Noah) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/13/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alatorre v. Blazin Wings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Alatorre
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Represented By: William Matthew Pao
Represented By: Alexandra Rochelle McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blazin Wings, Inc.
Represented By: Noah Jacob Woods
Represented By: Khatereh Sage Fahimi
Represented By: Stacey Eileen James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?