Gonzalez et al v. Ahern et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Gonzalez, Sergio Morales-Servin, Martin Lawrence Gallardo, Rocci Garrett, michael nathan lucas, Lawrence J. Gerrans, Martin Gallardo and Michael Lucas
Defendant: Derrick C. Hesselein, Gregory J. Ahern, Thomas F. Madigan, Dennis Houghtelling, California Forensic Medical Group, Deputy Ignont, Deputy Joe, Technician Kaiser, Alameda County Sheriff's Office, County of Alameda, Wellspring Inc and Aramark Correctional Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv07423
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Yolanda Huang (Huang, Yolanda) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Martin Gallardo, Rocci Garrett, Lawrence J. Gerrans, Daniel Gonzalez, Michael Lucas, Sergio Morales-Servin.. (Huang, Yolanda) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/17/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Gregory J. Ahern, Alameda County Sheriff's Office, Aramark Correctional Services, LLC, California Forensic Medical Group, County of Alameda, Deputy Ignont, Derrick C. Hesselein, Thomas F. Madigan, Technician Kaiser. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint and have been added to this case: County of Alameda, Alameda County Sheriff's Office, Deputy Joe, Deputy Ignont and Technician Kaiser. (This is a text-only entry.) (Huang, Yolanda) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by Martin Lawrence Gallardo, Rocci Garrett, Lawrence J. Gerrans, Daniel Gonzalez, Sergio Morales-Servin, michael nathan lucas (Huang, Yolanda) (Filed on 11/13/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Huang, Yolanda) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gregory J. Ahern, Alameda County Sheriff's Office, Aramark Correctional Services, LLC, California Forensic Medical Group, County of Alameda, Deputy Ignont, Deputy Joe, Derrick C. Hesselein, Dennis Houghtelling, Thomas F. Madigan, Technician Kaiser (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13878413). Filed by Martin Gallardo, Rocci Garrett, Lawrence J. Gerrans, Daniel Gonzalez, Michael Lucas, Sergio Morales-Servin . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, Yolanda) (Filed on 11/12/2019) Modified on 11/15/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Judge will not be randomly assigned to cast due to Civil Cover Sheet indication of Nature of Suit selection as 440 (Civil Rights.) Nature of Suit Selection used at case opening is 555. If 555 is correct Nature of Suit selection, please file Amended Civil Cover Sheet selecting 555 and file Amended Civil Cover Sheet as a separate docket entry re #1 . #1 Complaint filed by Daniel Gonzalez (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez et al v. Ahern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Gonzalez
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Represented By: Dennis Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Morales-Servin
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Represented By: Dennis Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Lawrence Gallardo
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocci Garrett
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Represented By: Dennis Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: michael nathan lucas
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence J. Gerrans
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Represented By: Dennis Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Gallardo
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Represented By: Dennis Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lucas
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Represented By: Dennis Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick C. Hesselein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F. Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Houghtelling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Ignont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technician Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellspring Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Correctional Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?