Pringle v. Wheeler
Plaintiff: Everett Pringle
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Case Number: 3:2019cv07432
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. The Clerk will now reassign this case to a United States District Judge because one or more of the parties has requested reassignment to a United States District Judge or has not consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 11/25/2019 a copy of this notice was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Everett Pringle. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Regarding Resources Available to Pro Se Litigants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/ 4/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 1:30 PM. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT against Andrew Wheeler (Filing fee $ 400, receipt 34611145742, no process). Filed by Everett Pringle. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2019: #2 Receipt) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pringle v. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett Pringle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?