Moreno v. Perkins Will, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Jose Moreno
Defendant: Port of San Francisco, San Francisco Mayors Office of Children, Youth & Families, San Francisco Fire Department, San Francisco Adult Probation Department, Jordan Knighton Architects, San Francisco District Attorneys Office, San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, San Francisco Administration, San Francisco Sheriffs Dept., San Francisco Police Department, San Francisco Public Health Dept., San Francisco Recreation and Park Department, Perkins Will, Inc., San Francisco Controller's Office and Mayors Office of Economic & Workforce Development
Case Number: 3:2019cv07443
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 29 Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable re #22 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 28 Mail Sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno Returned as Undeliverable re #23 Clerk's Notice requesting addresses for service of process. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #16 "Motion in Limine to Claim Preclusion for Discussing Lower Court Trial Rulings." (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 26 Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable re return copy of #16 MOTION in Limine. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 25 Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable re #14 Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 24 Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable re #11 Clerk's Notice. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE requesting addresses for service of process (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 21 Mail sent to Jose Rigoberto Moreno returned as undeliverable re (44 in 3:19-cv-04206-EMC) Order Relating Case, (8 in 3:19-cv-07443-EMC) Order Relating Case. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 20 Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable as addressed ; unable to forward re #7 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 19 Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable as addressed ; unable to forward re #9 Order Reassigning Case (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 Received: 3 computer discs re #17 Exhibit A by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 EXHIBIT A filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION in Limine to Claim Preclusion for Discussing Lower Court Trial Rulings filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. Responses due by 12/10/2019. Replies due by 12/17/2019. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #12 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 (REQUEST) Motion to File Electronically by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN REASSIGNED CASE - Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 15 Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable re #1 Complaint, #4 Social Security Procedural Order. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings RE #8 Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case related to 19-cv-7443-VKD. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 19-cv-04206-EMC. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 11/18/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Received Documents: Proposed USM-285 Forms by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER (SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTION). (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Pretrial Statement and Proposed Order by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. No process. IFP Pending. Filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. Perkins Will, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Mayors Office of Children, Youth & Families
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Fire Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Adult Probation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Knighton Architects
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco District Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Public Utilities Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Sheriffs Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Public Health Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Recreation and Park Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perkins Will, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Controller's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayors Office of Economic & Workforce Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Jose Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?