Board of Trustees of the Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. SMS Industrial Inc et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustess of the Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of The Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 apprentice Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of The Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of The Central California Pipe Trades Industry Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust Fund and United Association Local 62 Plumbers & Steamfitters Union
Defendant: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE PIPE TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 36 HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, SMS Industrial Inc. and Accredited Surety and Casualty Company Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv07444
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SMS Industrial Inc. (Gumberg, James) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SMS Industrial Inc... (Gumberg, James) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint bySMS Industrial Inc.. (Gumberg, James) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Accredited Surety and Casualty Company Inc, SMS Industrial Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Board of Trustess of the Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Health and Welfare Trust Fund.. (Chiu, Henry) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Chiu, Henry) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/27/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract and Claim Upon Contractor's License Bond against SMS Industrial Inc. and Accredited Surety and Casuality Company Inc (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13884108.). Filed by Board of Trustees of the Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Central California Pipe Trades Industry Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust Fund and United Association Local 62 Plumbers & Steamfitters Union (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chiu, Henry) (Filed on 11/13/2019) Modified on 11/13/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. SMS Industrial Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE PIPE TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 36 HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMS Industrial Inc.
Represented By: James K Gumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustess of the Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Henry Y. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of The Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 apprentice Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Henry Y. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of The Pipe Trades District Council No. 36 Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Henry Y. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of The Central California Pipe Trades Industry Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust Fund
Represented By: Henry Y. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Association Local 62 Plumbers & Steamfitters Union
Represented By: Henry Y. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?