Stenson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Gregory stenson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv07543
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Acknowledgment of Receipt re #7 Summons Issued. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Bradt, Lara) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 4, 2019 Service packet delivered to the U.S. Marshals Post Box in the Clerks Office mailroom. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM forms)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gregory stenson.. (Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gregory stenson. (Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Filed byGregory stenson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 11/15/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stenson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Lara Anne Oravec Bradt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory stenson
Represented By: Katherine Rose Siegfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?