Sievers v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Sievers
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv07794
Filed: November 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of New York (Central Islip), 2:19-cv-06157 JMA GRB, Sievers v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-07794 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 168 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-06157. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 27, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Ortiz, Grisel)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 168) IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rn]es of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. (Ortiz, Grisel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 168) IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Ortiz, Grisel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosemarie Sievers. Monsanto Company served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/28/2019. (Luhana, Roopal)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 31, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 31, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number ANYEDC-11999783 (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Rosemarie Sievers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sievers v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Sievers
Represented By: Eric T. Chaffin
Represented By: Roopal Premchand Luhana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?