Dormaier v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Roger L Dormaier
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv07820
Filed: November 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Washington (Seattle), 2:19-cv-1763 RAJ, Dormaier v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-07820 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 168 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-01763. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 MDL 2741 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 168); In re Roundup Products Liability Litigation; Northern District of California; assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. (PM)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Monsanto Company. (GT)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT)
November 1, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT --Civil Complaint, Jury Trial Demanded-- against defendant(s) Monsanto Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5989347) Attorney Michael Woerner added to party Roger L Dormaier(pty:pla), filed by Roger L Dormaier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Woerner, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dormaier v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger L Dormaier
Represented By: Michael Woerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?