Estate of Larry Sharpe et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Estate of Larry Sharpe and Maggie Sharpe
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv07869
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: USDC, Eastern District of Missouri (St. Louis), 4:19-cv-02369-NAB, Estate of Larry Sharpe, et al -v- Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-07869-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-168), MDL No. 2741 cc: JPMDL (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED in from United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri (St. Louis); Case Number 4:19-cv-02369-NAB. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received.
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-168) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
November 18, 2019 THIRD Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiffs Estate of Larry Sharpe, Maggie Sharpe to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/25/2019. (JMP)
September 30, 2019 SECOND Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiffs Estate of Larry Sharpe, Maggie Sharpe to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/7/2019. (KJS)
September 11, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiffs Estate of Larry Sharpe, Maggie Sharpe to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/18/2019. (KJS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 19, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Larry Sharpe. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Goza, Kirk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2019: #3 Waiver of Service) (BAK).
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs Jury Demand,, filed by Larry Sharpe.(Goza, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Larry Sharpe et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Larry Sharpe
Represented By: Kirk John Goza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Sharpe
Represented By: Kirk John Goza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?