McAteer v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Cecilia McAteer
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv07879
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: USDC, Eastern District of Missouri (St. Louis), 4:19-cv-02410-NCC, Cecilia McAteer -v- Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-07879-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-168), MDL No. 2741 cc: JPMDL (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED in from United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri (St. Louis); Case Number 4:19-cv-02410-NCC. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received.
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-168) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 27, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (MFG)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7421797, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Cecilia McAteer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Attachment Notice of Lawsuit, #4 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service)(Goza, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAteer v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia McAteer
Represented By: Kirk John Goza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?