Valverde et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Jose' Valverde and Emma Valverde
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv07985
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
December 6, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Eastern District of Missouri, 19-03076 Valverde, et al., opened in California Northern District as 19-07985 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 170 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-03076. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-170) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jose' Valverde, Emma Valverde. Monsanto Company served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Adler, Enrique)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
November 12, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Enrique Elliot Adler. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Defendant Monsanto Company Process Server: HPS Process Service and Investigations (BAK)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Demand For Jury Trial against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7573371, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Jose' Valverde, Emma Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Form Notice Of Intent To Use Process Server)(Adler, Enrique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valverde et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Eric Gordon Lasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose' Valverde
Represented By: Enrique Elliot Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Valverde
Represented By: Enrique Elliot Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?