Gingerich et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Sandra Gingerich and Gilbert Gingerich
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv08004
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Iowa, 1:19-cv-00123 LRR, Gingerich v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-08004 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 170 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00123. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-170) MDL No. 2741. This action is transferred to USDC Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. Signed by John W Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, on 12/04/2019. (Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California) (des)
November 15, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/15/2019 (ddln set pursuant to #3 Summons Returned). (skm)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra Gingerich, Gilbert Gingerich. Monsanto Company served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Jones, Samuel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (ksy)
November 12, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (ksy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3059036.), filed by Sandra Gingerich, Gilbert Gingerich. Scheduling Report due by 2/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Draft Summons) (Jones, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gingerich et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Gingerich
Represented By: Samuel E Jones
Represented By: Caitlin Leah Slessor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Gingerich
Represented By: Samuel E Jones
Represented By: Caitlin Leah Slessor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?