Sophus v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Demetrius Sophus
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv08031
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Social Security Administration. (Snyder, Patrick) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 Mail sent to Demetrius Sophus returned as undeliverable re #7 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 Mail sent to Demetrius Sophus returned as undeliverable re #5 Social Security Procedural Order. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Social Security Administration.. (Snyder, Patrick) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: The parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/21/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER RE: STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-01919. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's #3 Motion For Change of Venue, as to which Plaintiff has filed no opposition or other response, is GRANTED by this court in accordance with Local Civil Rule 72.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 10/29/2019.(lcdar1)
August 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue #3 due by 9/16/19. (kk)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On July 9, 2019, Defendant filed Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue #3 . As of this date, Plaintiff has not filed an opposition or other response to Defendant's motion. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff file his opposition, or other response, by no later than September 16, 2019. Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, is advised, in accordance with Fox v. Strickland, 837 F.2d 507 (D.C. Cir 1988), that the Court may treat a motion as conceded if the opposing party (In this instance, Plaintiff) does not file an opposition within the prescribed time. LCvR 7(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 8/15/2019. (lcdar1)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Change Venue by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Reed, Margaret)
July 8, 2019 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for full case management, up to and excluding trial. (zad)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge, to be assigned at random by the Clerk's Office, for full case management, up to and excluding trial. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/08/2019. (lckbj1)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (zef, )
June 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 003610 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haynes, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sophus v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Sophus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Margaret Winslow Reed
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Represented By: Patrick William Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?