The Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. United States Department of the Treasury
Plaintiff: The Center for Investigative Reporting and Aaron Glantz
Defendant: Treasury, Dept of and United States Department of the Treasury
Case Number: 3:2019cv08181
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/10/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING re #10 Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which to Answer filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting, Aaron Glantz, United States Department of the Treasury. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/27/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH TO ANSWER filed by United States Department of the Treasury, The Center for Investigative Reporting and Aaron Glantz. (Samples, John) (Filed on 1/24/2020) Modified on 1/27/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Wesley Samples (Samples, John) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States Department of the Treasury. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against United States Department of the Treasury (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13985079.). Filed by Aaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2019) Modified on 12/26/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. United States Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Center for Investigative Reporting
Represented By: Diana Victoria Baranetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Glantz
Represented By: Diana Victoria Baranetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasury, Dept of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: John Wesley Samples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?